Michael Crane Posted January 26, 2014 Share Posted January 26, 2014 (edited) I have only read 1 of the 5 volumes. Was there anybody that resigned or stepped down from the board? Was anybody replaced? Edited January 26, 2014 by Michael Crane Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Joseph Backes Posted January 26, 2014 Share Posted January 26, 2014 (edited) No. No members of the Review Board resigned. The board was composed of John Tunheim, he was the chairman, then there was Dr. Anna K. Nelson, Dr. William Joyce, Dr. Kermit Hall, and Dr.Henry Graff. Kermit Hall and Anna Nelson are now deceased. I'm still amazed that they're gone. Henry Graff was the oldest and most absent member. I think he's still alive. I haven't seen or heard anything about Dr. William Joyce, and I assume he's still alive too. Now keep in mind that the Board members did not work full-time on this. They had and kept their original full-time gigs and only came in to D.C. once a month or so for a day or two. They may have an open meeting, or not, and vote on releasing records. Or they got a briefing from an intelligence agency about a document or an issue concerning something in that document. It's the staff that worked full-time, and most of them were young people fresh out of college or grad school. At the staff level there were people coming and going, which is somewhat to be expected. It was only going to be a short time that you were to be employed. They had to get security clearances, I would think. The JFK Act had a sunset provision so no matter what they were gone by the summer of 1998. Edited January 26, 2014 by Joseph Backes Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Michael Crane Posted January 27, 2014 Author Share Posted January 27, 2014 (edited) Thanks Joe, There were people who were replaced on the other commissions,so I just wanted to know if anything happened on this one. I noticed that you did not include Doug or Jeremy (only ones that I knew of) on your list. Was this because they were only staff members? And do you know if any staff members stepped down or had to be replaced because they might not have "played along to get along" Edited January 27, 2014 by Michael Crane Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Joseph Backes Posted January 27, 2014 Share Posted January 27, 2014 They were staff members, not Board members. I believe the ARRB Final Report is available online somewhere and that would list the staff members. Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Michael Crane Posted January 27, 2014 Author Share Posted January 27, 2014 Thanks again partner,I certainly appreciate it. Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
William Kelly Posted January 29, 2014 Share Posted January 29, 2014 Two top ARRB staff executive directors resigned, Jeremy Gunn under a cloud that was not clear why. I don't think Doug Horne even knows, but I think it was because of the ONI chiles and the LTCM Terri Pike affair, that was covered up until after the ARRB had disbanded. BK Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Michael Crane Posted January 30, 2014 Author Share Posted January 30, 2014 (edited) A big thank you to you Bill. Do you know if Doug`s FOIA request for the briefing board/s was denied or not? Volume 4 left this request unanswered. Edited January 30, 2014 by Michael Crane Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
William Kelly Posted January 31, 2014 Share Posted January 31, 2014 No I don't know about the briefing boards request but Doug has been active recently and you should be able to ask him. Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Recommended Posts
Please sign in to comment
You will be able to leave a comment after signing in
Sign In Now